EP1445220 - Method and device for removing objects from a carrier layer by layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSi Industries B.V. Lissenveld 41 4941 VL Raamsdonksveer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states CSi Industries B.V. 41, Lissenveld 4941 VL Raamsdonksveer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klundert, Mark van de 41, Lissenveld 4941 VL Raamsdonksveer / NL | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075370.9 | 05.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | NL20031022628 | 07.02.2003 Original published format: NL 1022628 | [2004/33] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445220 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445220 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65G59/04, B65G57/04 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
B65G57/04 (EP);
B65G57/035 (EP);
B65G59/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/22] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum lagenweisen Abstapeln von Gegenständen | [2004/33] | English: | Method and device for removing objects from a carrier layer by layer | [2004/33] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour désempiler des articles par couches | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3780884 (JONES R) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-14 * column 4, line 10 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [X]US3917082 (HOWARD RICHARD W, et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-16 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 42; figures 7-9 *; | [A]US4753564 (PEARCE RONALD A [US], et al) [A] * column 8, line 10 - line 25; figures 3,7B * | by applicant | DE3117396 |