EP1442744 - EP4 receptor ligand and use against neuropathic pain, colon cancer, HIV and migrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/32] | Use of EP4 receptor ligands in the treatment of, inter alia, neuropathic pain and colon cancer | ||
[2006/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bamford, Mark, GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow Essex, CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
Green, Richard Howard Deceased / GB | 03 /
Coles, Richard GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage Hertfordshire, SG1 2NY / GB | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Cooke, Tracey, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Cooke, Tracey (GB), et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road GB-Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04075431.9 | 08.08.2000 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | GB19990018745 | 10.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918745 | GB19990028437 | 01.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9928437 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1442744 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1442744 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1442744 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4035, A61P35/00, A61P25/02, A61P25/06, A61P31/18, C07D209/64 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4035 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/32] | A61K31/4035, A61P35/00, A61P25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/32] | Title | German: | EP4 Rezeptor Ligand und Verwendung gegen neuropatischen Schmerzen, Colon Krebs, HIV und Migräne | [2006/27] | English: | EP4 receptor ligand and use against neuropathic pain, colon cancer, HIV and migrane | [2006/27] | French: | Ligand du récepteur EP4 et utilisation contre les douleurs neuropathiques, le cancer du colon, le HIV et la migraine | [2006/28] |
Former [2004/32] | Verwendung von EP4 Rezeptor Liganden zur Behandlung von, unter anderem, neuropatischen Schmerzen und Colon Krebs | ||
Former [2004/32] | Use of EP4 receptor ligands in the treatment of, inter alia, neuropathic pain and colon cancer | ||
Former [2004/32] | Utilisation de ligands du récepteur ep4 pour le traitement de, entre autres, douleurs neuropathiques et cancer du colon | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00956408.9 / EP1202730 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2006 | CH | 20.12.2006 | CY | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | LI | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | PT | 24.04.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | LU | 08.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/40] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 24.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
CH | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
LI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH574409 (SANDOZ AG) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]US4618683 (DEBERNARDIS JOHN F [US], et al) [A] * column 1, line 15 - line 55 *; | [A]US4851399 (PHILLIPPS GORDON H [GB], et al) [A] * column 3, line 34 - line 46 * |