EP1460684 - No-flow underfill process and material therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Workman, Derek B. 10219 Paradise Lane Noblesville Indiana 46060 / US | 02 /
Stepniak, Frank 21311 Oakview Drive Noblesville Indiana 46060 / US | 03 /
Chaudhuri, Arun K. 13940 Stonemill Circle Carmel Indiana 46032 / US | 04 /
Walsh, Matthew R. 1888 West 500 south Sharpsville Indiana 46068 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2013/14] | Harrison Goddard Foote 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/39] | Denton, Michael John Delphi European Headquarters, 64, avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 60059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04075615.7 | 26.02.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | US20030391231 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 391231 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1460684 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460684 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, H01L21/58, H01L21/60, H01L23/29, H01L23/00, C08K5/54, C08L63/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/056 (EP,US);
H01L2224/131 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81191 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83192 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01075 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/056, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/131, H01L2924/014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/3512, H01L2924/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2004/39] | H01L21/58, H01L21/56, H01L21/60, C08L63/00, C08K5/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/03] |
Former [2005/23] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | No-flow Unterfüllprozess und Material dafür | [2004/39] | English: | No-flow underfill process and material therefor | [2004/39] | French: | Procédé et matériau de sous-remplissage sans écoulement | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 20.03.2017 | GB | 18.04.2017 | DE | 01.09.2017 | [2018/14] |
Former [2018/10] | FR | 20.03.2017 | |
DE | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | FR | 20.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP8199045 ; | [A]US5904791 (BEARINGER CLAYTON R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19925961 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 4-7* the whole document *; | [XY]WO0155243 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 8,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,9-11; | [Y]WO0183607 (LOCTITE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * page 9, line 3 - line 36 *; | [Y]FR2812971 (ORIENT SEMICONDUCTOR ELECT LTD [TW]) [Y] 1-7,9-11,14,15 * figures 2A-2D; claim 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP8199045 A 19960806 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 8,12,13 * abstract * [Y] 1-7,9-11 | Examination | WO9837134 | US6214642 | US2002167077 | US2002173075 | US2002190370 | EP1395101 |