EP1455231 - Controlling a position of a mass, especially in a lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Butler, Hans Aardheuvel 38 5685 AC Best / NL | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Maas, Abraham Johannes, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/37] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, Scheveningseweg 82, Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075731.2 | 05.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | EP20030075660 | 06.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03075660 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455231 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455231 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G05B19/19 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G03F7/70725 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/28] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontrolle einer Position einer Masse, besonders in einem lithographischen Apparat | [2004/37] | English: | Controlling a position of a mass, especially in a lithographic apparatus | [2004/37] | French: | Contrôler une position d' une masse, en particulier dans un appareil lithographique | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 30.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2270998 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * pages 11-22; figures 2,6 * [Y] 4; | [A]US5877845 (MAKINOUCHI SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 4 *; | [A]US6260282 (YUAN BAUSAN [US], et al) [A] 1* column 1 - column 2 *; | [Y] - BUTLER H ET AL, "Model reference adaptive control of a direct-drive DC motor", IEEE CONTROL SYSTEMS MAGAZINE USA, (198901), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0272-1708, pages 80 - 84, XP002494834 [Y] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/37.16756 |