EP1433425 - Clamp coagulator/cutting system for ultrasonic surgical instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davison, Thomas W. 83 Farm Hill Drive North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 02 /
Dimatteo, Stephen 26 Cedar Lane Seekonk, MA 02771 / US | 03 /
Smith, Paul Apartment 90, 30 Old Carriage Road West Warwick, RI 02839 / US | 04 /
Whipple, Gary 406 Newport Avenue South Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04075914.4 | 26.01.1994 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | US19930008809 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: US 8809 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1433425 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433425 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,US);
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00353 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2825 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2945 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320071 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320089 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320094 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1432 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/27] | Title | German: | Ultraschallvorrichtung mit Greifer zur Koagulation oder zum Schneiden | [2004/27] | English: | Clamp coagulator/cutting system for ultrasonic surgical instruments | [2004/27] | French: | Appareil de coagulation ou de coupe ultrasonore à pince | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 03.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01201660.6 / EP1125555 | EP94907898.4 / EP0681457 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01232948 ; | [A]DE7705947U (STORZ) [A] 1* page 7, line 14 - page 9, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2032501 (KLOZ) [A] 1 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 10; figures 4,4A *; | [AD]US3636943 (BALAMUTH LEWIS) [AD] 1 * column 11, line 61 - column 12, line 55; figures 10,11 *; | [A]US3792701 (KLOZ H, et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 60 - line 63 *; | [A]US4825865 (ZELMAN JERRY [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891213), vol. 013, no. 562, Database accession no. (C - 665), & JP01232948 A 19890918 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US2714890 | US3636943 | US3862630 | US5057199 | US5059210 |