EP1479807 - Device for attaching and guiding one or several pulley cords of a jacquard machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Van de Wielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | [2006/28] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Van de Wielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanderjeugt, Bram Pannenhuisstraat 45 8900 Ieper / BE | 02 /
Hanssens, Benedict Ernest Dewittestraat 13 8510 Marke / BE | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Ostyn, Frans KOB NV President Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Ostyn, Frans K.O.B. NV, Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 04076372.4 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | BE20030000308 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: BE 200300308 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479807 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479807 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479807 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D03C3/12 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
D03C3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, TR [2006/28] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen und Führen einer oder mehrerer Flaschenzugkordeln einer Jacquardmaschine | [2004/48] | English: | Device for attaching and guiding one or several pulley cords of a jacquard machine | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif pour attacher et guider un ou plusieurs cordons de palonnier d' une mécanique Jacquard | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/41] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]BE1005823 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0801161 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [DA]EP0839937 (STAUBLI LYON [FR]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * |