EP1488687 - Plant pot support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. van Zanten Holding B.V. Dreeslaan 10 2672 DN Naaldwijk / NL | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Zanten, Evert Tuindersweg 13 2676 BD Maasdijk / NL | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/52] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, Scheveningseweg 82, Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04076765.9 | 15.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | NL20031023678 | 17.06.2003 Original published format: NL 1023678 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488687 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488687 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/04 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
A01G9/04 (EP,US);
F16B2200/30 (EP,US);
Y10T403/65 (EP,US);
Y10T403/655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | Pflanzentopfträger | [2004/52] | English: | Plant pot support | [2004/52] | French: | Support de pot de fleur | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | IE | 15.06.2009 | LU | 15.06.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
LU | 15.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 15.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SI | 25.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2019249 (BRADLEY WILLIAM T) [X] 1,4 * figure - * [A] 9,10; | [A]US4248014 (WILLIAMES GEOFFREY A) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [XA]FR2519246 (ABEL [FR]) [X] 1,5-7 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 6; figure - * [A] 9,10; | [XA]NL8502285 (JOHANNES BERNARDUS MARIA VAN D) [X] 1,5,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 9,10; | [XA]US4969290 (SKORETZ DALLAS [US]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 4, line 22; figures 1,2,6-9 * [A] 2 |