EP1491697 - Concrete floor part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dycore B.V. Ambachtsweg 16 4906 CH Oosterhout / NL | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Wit, Johannes p/a Dycore B.V. Postbus 197 4900 AD Oosterhout / NL | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04076771.7 | 16.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | NL20031023761 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: NL 1023761 | [2005/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491697 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491697 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/02, E04B5/48, B28B23/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
E04B5/48 (EP);
B28B23/028 (EP);
E04B5/04 (EP);
B28B7/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Betonbodenelement | [2005/01] | English: | Concrete floor part | [2005/01] | French: | Elément de plancher en béton | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.07.2008 | CY | 02.07.2008 | CZ | 02.07.2008 | DK | 02.07.2008 | EE | 02.07.2008 | FI | 02.07.2008 | IT | 02.07.2008 | PL | 02.07.2008 | RO | 02.07.2008 | SI | 02.07.2008 | SK | 02.07.2008 | TR | 02.07.2008 | BG | 02.10.2008 | SE | 02.10.2008 | GR | 03.10.2008 | ES | 13.10.2008 | PT | 02.12.2008 | HU | 03.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
HU | 03.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
GR | 03.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
PL | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
SE | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
IT | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
RO | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
CZ | 02.07.2008 | ||
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SK | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
EE | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
DK | 02.07.2008 | ||
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.07.2008 | |
FI | 02.07.2008 | ||
SI | 02.07.2008 | ||
BG | 02.10.2008 | ||
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | SI | 02.07.2008 | |
ES | 13.10.2008 | ||
PT | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1533735 (LEEMHUIS) [X] 1-3,9,13 * page 2, column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [X]US3442058 (NASLUND KENNETH C, et al) [X] 1-6,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - line 44 *; | [XY]DE3009378 (RUPPMANN OTTO) [X] 1-3,13 [Y] 10-12; | [Y]DE3702447 (LIAS FRANKEN LEICHTBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * figure - *; | [XA]EP1126095 (ZAMBELLI SERGIO [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * figure - * [A] 9; | [XA]US2003097806 (BROWN JOHN G [US]) [X] 24-26 * paragraphs [0752] - [0758]; figures 100-106 *[A] 14 | by applicant | FR1525178 |