EP1523040 - Flip chip heat sink package and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chengalva, Suresh K. 3007 Matthew Dr. - Appt. G Kokomo, IN 46902 / US | 02 /
Mandel, Larry M. 21255 Cunion court Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | 03 /
Sarma, Dwadasi H. 4707 Glen Moor Way Kokomo, IN 46902 / US | 04 /
Gertiser, Kevin M. 624 Heatherwood court Noblesville, IN 46060 / US | 05 /
Zimmerman, David W. 12019 Colbarn Dr. Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | BorgWarner France SAS Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Delphi France SAS c/o Delphi Technologies Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/10] | Robert, Vincent Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/15] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Plaine de France Paris Nord II BP 60059 Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04077702.1 | 30.09.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | US20030683015 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: US 683015 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1523040 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1523040 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1523040 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/065, H01L23/367, H01L23/427, H01L23/42, H01L21/48, H01L21/56 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
H01L23/427 (EP,US);
H01L21/4878 (EP,US);
H01L21/4882 (EP,US);
H01L23/3675 (EP,US);
H01L23/3677 (EP,US);
H01L23/42 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | H01L25/065, H01L23/367, H01L23/427 | ||
Former IPC [2005/15] | H01L25/065, H01L23/367 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/35] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flipchip Kühlgehäuse und Methode | [2005/15] | English: | Flip chip heat sink package and method | [2005/15] | French: | Boîtier pour puce renversée avec dissipateur de chaleur et méthode associée | [2018/17] |
Former [2005/15] | Boîtier de type puce inversée avec dissipateur de chaleur et méthode associée | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2004 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | PT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | IE | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | LU | 30.09.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 30.09.2004 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PT | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
IE | 30.09.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 30.09.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 29.08.2018 | |
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5608610 (BRZEZINSKI DENNIS [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6008536 (MERTOL ATILA [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6101092 (ONISHI YUKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11-14,17-19 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,3,5 * [Y] 4,5,9,10,15,16,20; | [XY]US6118177 (LISCHNER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,10,13,15,16,19,20; | [A]US2001013640 (TAO TETSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XY]US2001026957 (ATWOOD EUGENE R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,17,18 * figures 1,2A,3,5 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0083] * [Y] 5-9,13-16,19,20; | [Y]EP1178594 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] *; | [XY]US6411507 (AKRAM SALMAN [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,17,18 * figure 2 * * column 3, line 9 - line 46 * [Y] 2-8,10,13,15,16,19,20; | [XY]JP2002353388 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,6,7,9-12,15-19 * figures 1-3,9,17,18 * [Y] 8,14,20; | [XY]US2003051868 (DISHONGH TERRANCE J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13,17,18 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * [Y] 7-9,14-16,19,20; | [XY]US2003134454 (HOULE SABINA J [US]) [X] 1,9,11,12,14,17,18 * figures 3,5A-5C,6 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 2-8,10,13,15,16,19,20; | [Y] - "A HEAT SINK WITH THERMAL CAPACITANCE", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200004), no. 432, ISSN 0374-4353, page 640, XP000968830 [Y] 1-5,10-13,16-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1178594 | JP2002353388 |