EP1508965 - Electric motor or generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Light Engineering Corporation 8158 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caamano, Ramon A. 6450 Mt Madonna Road Gilroy California 95020 / US | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04077742.7 | 19.03.1998 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508965 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1508965 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/00, F03D7/02 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
F01D15/10 (EP);
H02K1/02 (EP,KR);
F02C7/268 (EP);
H02K1/14 (EP);
H02K1/141 (EP);
H02K1/148 (EP);
H02K1/18 (EP);
H02K21/24 (EP);
H02K29/10 (EP);
H02K3/28 (EP);
H02P6/16 (EP);
H02P9/10 (EP);
H02P9/302 (EP);
H02K1/04 (EP);
H02K2213/09 (EP);
H02K2213/12 (EP);
H02K7/1823 (EP);
H02K7/183 (EP);
H02P2209/07 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H02P9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/30] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromotor oder -generator | [2005/08] | English: | Electric motor or generator | [2005/08] | French: | Moteur ou générateur électrique | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 20.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2016 | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25] | 13.02.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 26.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98911809.6 / EP1062718 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980911809) is 13.08.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 13.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2010 | 31.03.2016 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4613763 (SWANSEN THEODORE L [US]) [Y] 2-5* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0813289 (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-5 | Examination | US4392072 | JPS6158450 | US5652485 | US5671524 |