EP1553493 - Restart of a computer in a redundant computer configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wenger, Michael Kopernikusstr. 5 38126 Braunschweig / DE | [2005/28] | Application number, filing date | 04078334.2 | 07.12.2004 | [2005/28] | Priority number, date | DE20041001819 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004001819 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553493 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553493 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G06F11/165 (EP);
G06F11/004 (EP);
G06F11/1417 (EP);
G06F11/1658 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | Wiederanlauf eines Rechners in einer redundanten Rechnerkonfiguration | [2005/28] | English: | Restart of a computer in a redundant computer configuration | [2005/28] | French: | Réamorçage d'un ordinateur dans une configuration redondante | [2005/28] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 07.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | GB | 05.09.2007 | IE | 05.09.2007 | LT | 05.09.2007 | RO | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | LU | 07.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | IS | 05.01.2008 | PT | 06.02.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
LU | 07.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | EE | 05.09.2007 | |
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | EE | 05.09.2007 | |
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | GB | 05.09.2007 | |
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | GB | 05.09.2007 | |
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | GB | 05.09.2007 | |
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
LT | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
IS | 05.01.2008 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | LT | 05.09.2007 | |
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 05.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2002318624 ; | [A]DE4000295 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-5* column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 38 *; | [XA]US2003163768 (DAWKINS GEORGE JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0033] - [0035] - [0040] - [0045] * [A] 5; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 10, Database accession no. 2003-107388, XP002324354 & JP2002318624 A 20021031 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 5 | [ ] - "Automatic translation of JP2002-318624", ONLINE, (20021031) [ ] * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0021] - [0029] * |