EP1525797 - Synergistic microbicidal combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2013 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Warwick, Eileen Fleck 1221 Snyder Road Lansdale Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 02 /
Diehl, Megan Anne 24 Maple Avenue Line Lexington Pennsylvania 18932 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2005/17] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al ROHM AND HAAS (UK) LTD. European Patent Department 28th Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04078581.8 | 18.01.2003 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | US20020352621P | 31.01.2002 Original published format: US 352621 P | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1525797 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1525797 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, // A01N43/80, A01N43/50, A01N35/02 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,BR);
A01N31/04 (BR);
A01N31/14 (BR);
A01N35/10 (BR);
A01N37/06 (BR);
A01N37/34 (BR);
A01N37/36 (BR);
A01N43/50 (BR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N43/50, A01N43/40, A01N39/00, A01N37/36, A01N37/34, A01N37/10, A01N37/06, A01N31/04 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N59/16, A01N43/50, A01N43/40, A01N39/00, A01N37/36, A01N37/34, A01N37/10, A01N37/06, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/17] | Title | German: | Synergistische mikrobizide Kombination | [2005/17] | English: | Synergistic microbicidal combination | [2005/17] | French: | Association microbicide synergique | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/06] | 28.12.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2013 | 31.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03250329.4 / EP1332675 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030250329) is 23.03.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9908530 (THOR CHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1,13,14 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 2 * * page 8, line 13 - line 22 *; | [X]US6114366 (LUTZ PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * claims 1-3 * * column 4, line 5 - line 7 *; | [A]US6121302 (ROTHENBURGER STEPHEN JUDE [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP1082901 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,4,8 *; | [A]EP1084619 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-4 ** examples 1,2 * | Examination | EP0435439 | by applicant | - KULL, F.C.; EISMAN, P.C.; SYLWESTROWICZ, H.D.; MAYER, R.L., APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 9, pages 538 - 541 |