EP1568368 - Pharmaceutical combination comprising a CDK inhibitor and a VEGF receptor inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma AG Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siemeister, Gerhard Reimerswalder Steig 26 13503 Berlin / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 04090071.4 | 26.02.2004 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1568368 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/427, A61K31/4439, A61K31/517, A61P35/00 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/427 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/517 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/427, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT [2006/20] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Kombination enthaltend einen CDK Inhibitoren und einen VEGF Rezeptor Inhibitoren | [2005/35] | English: | Pharmaceutical combination comprising a CDK inhibitor and a VEGF receptor inhibitor | [2005/35] | French: | Combinaison pharmaceutique comprenant un inhibiteur de CDK et un inhibiteur du recepteur VEGF | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 17.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.02.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9835958 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1-10* the whole document *; | [DY]WO9924416 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO0027819 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO0144217 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO03040102 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PY] - MISRA RAJ N ET AL, "N-(cycloalkylamino)acyl-2-aminothiazole inhibitors of cyclin-dependent kinase 2. N-[5-[[[5-(1,1-dimethylethyl)-2-oxazolyl]methyl]thio]-2-thi azolyl]-4- piperidinecarboxamide (BMS-387032), a highly efficacious and selective antitumor agent.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. 25 MAR 2004, (20040325), vol. 47, no. 7, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1719 - 1728, XP002302339 [PY] 1-10 * abstract * * table 1 * * table 3 * * scheme 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0305568 | [Y] - SENDEROWICZ ADRIAN M, "Small-molecule cyclin-dependent kinase modulators.", ONCOGENE, (20030929), vol. 22, no. 42, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 6609 - 6620, XP002302340 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206954 | [Y] - BOLD G ET AL, "New anilinophthalazines as potent and orally well absorbed inhibitors of the VEGF receptor tyrosine kinases useful as antagonists of tumor-driven angiogenesis.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY. 15 JUN 2000, (20000615), vol. 43, no. 12, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2310 - 2323, XP002302341 [Y] 1-10 * chart 1, compound CGP 79787D * * abstract * * page 2312, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2313, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9909443 | [Y] - WOOD J M ET AL, "PTK787/ZK 222584, A NOVEL AND POTENT INHIBITOR OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR TYROSINE KINASES, IMPAIRS VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-INDUCED RESPONSES AND TUMOR GROWTH AFTER ORAL ADMINISTRATION", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20000415), vol. 60, no. 8, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2178 - 2189, XP000971163 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |