EP1645897 - Method of fabrication of an optical or electronic module comprising a plastic housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Fiber Optics GmbH Wernerwerkdamm 16 13629 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weigert, Martin Am Hardt 6 93152 Hardt / DE | 02 /
Hurt, Hans Alfons-Bayerer-Str. 19 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090388.2 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645897 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645897 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, H01L31/0203 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/4206 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
H01L31/02325 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/51] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines mit einem Kunststoffgehäuse versehenen optischen oder elektronischen Moduls | [2006/15] | English: | Method of fabrication of an optical or electronic module comprising a plastic housing | [2006/15] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un module optique ou électronique comprenant un boîtier plastique | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2010/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5785273 ; | [Y]EP0435468 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [Y] 11 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5500540 (JEWELL JACK L [US], et al) [Y] 16 * column 8 *; | [A]US2003117482 (BORDER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 5 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2004008952 (KRAGL HANS [DE]) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [XY]DE10250540 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,13-15,17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0025] , [0038] , [0043]; figures 2-5 * [Y] 10,11,16 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820903), vol. 006, no. 170, Database accession no. (E - 128), & JP57085273 A 19820527 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 10 * abstract * | Examination | EP1622204 |