EP1545000 - Circuit for regulating the duty cycle of an electrical signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doppke, Harald Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 50 45481 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Theil, Detlev Tomtebogatan 42 11338 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
Harms, Torsten Lilienstrasse 75 47906 Kempen / DE | 04 /
van Waasen, Stefan Batsmansvägen 35 19248 Sollentuna / SE | 05 /
Grewing, Christian Trädgardsvägen 79 19146 Sollentuna / SE | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Haeusler, Rüdiger Hans-Jörg Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann (DHS) Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Haeusler, Rüdiger Hans-Jörg Schindelmann, Haeusler, Dilg. Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH iG Nussbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090493.0 | 17.12.2004 | [2005/25] | Priority number, date | US20030531005P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531005 P | US20040824712 | 14.04.2004 Original published format: US 824712 | [2005/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545000 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545000 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/017 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H03K7/08 (EP,US);
H03K5/1565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/11] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Regelung des Duty Cycle eines elektrischen Signals | [2005/25] | English: | Circuit for regulating the duty cycle of an electrical signal | [2005/25] | French: | Circuit pour réguler le rapport cyclique d'un signal électrique | [2005/25] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 19.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.12.2007 | [2009/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5912593 (SUSAK DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003146779 (KAO HSUEH-WU [TW]) [A] 1,7-9* figure 5 * |