EP1442649 - Combine and straw chopper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weichholdt, Dirk 120 A rue Maréchal Foch 57200 Sarreguemines / FR | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Holst, Sönke, Dr., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department, Steubenstrasse 36-42 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04100213.0 | 22.01.2004 | [2004/32] | Priority number, date | DE2003103503 | 30.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303503 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1442649 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1442649 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12, A01F12/40 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
A01D41/1243 (EP,US);
A01F12/40 (EP,US);
Y10S460/901 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FI, IT [2005/17] |
Former [2004/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mähdrescher mit Strohhäcksler | [2004/32] | English: | Combine and straw chopper | [2004/32] | French: | Moissonneuse-batteuse et hache-paille | [2004/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 02.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 07.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4552547 (CARNEWAL JOSE A C L [BE], et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]EP0727135 (SAME SPA [IT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0958727 (SCHRATTENECKER FRANZ [AT]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0018] , [0029]; figures 13,14 * | by applicant | US5232405 | DE4431802 | EP0727135 | EP0958727 | WO0101754 | DE10064356 | DE10256744 |