EP1559449 - Flexible wall having fire resistant properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goldfire Sprl Rue Colonel Bourg, 115 1140 Bruxelles / BE | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/31] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Goldfire Sprl Rue Colonel Bourg, 115 1140 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldberg, Simon Rue Geleytsbeek, 16F 1180, Bruxelles / BE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | van Straaten, Joop, et al Office Kirkpatrick Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Van Straaten, Joop, et al OFFICE KIRKPATRICK S.A., Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 04100280.9 | 27.01.2004 | [2005/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1559449 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1559449 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A62C2/10 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
A62C2/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Title | German: | Biegsame Wand mit feuerbeständigen Eigenschaften | [2005/31] | English: | Flexible wall having fire resistant properties | [2005/31] | French: | Paroi souple présentant des propriétés de résistance au feu | [2005/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | IT | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | GB | 27.01.2009 | LU | 27.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
LU | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
GB | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
IT | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 07.05.2008 | |
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1285647 (STAVOINDUSTRIA NARODNY PODNIK [CS]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB2092214 (SCHROEDERS THEO) [A] 8,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0285338 (GATES FORMED FIBRE PRODUCTS [US]) [A] 3,4 * column 4, lines 41-44 * * column 6, lines 27-53; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9101312U (TEMPEX GMBH SCHUTZAUSRÜSTUNGEN) [A] 1,2 * page 2, lines 8-23 * * page 3, lines 7-14 * * page 4, lines 16-24 * * page 5, lines 6-8; figure - *; | [A]DE4110454 (GUELDENPFENNIG ROLF DR [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5204172 (GIDLEY ROY J [GB]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]GB2311008 (T & N TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 7,10 * page 2, lines 16-18 * * page 3, line 24 *; | [A]DE10150307 (ENFORTECH ENTWICKLUNG UND FORS [AT]) [A] 5,6 * column 1, lines 55-65 * | by applicant | FR2300582 |