EP1445871 - Integrated multi-mode bandpass sigma-delta receiver subsystem with interference mitigation and method of using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, William J. Motorola Inc. 8000 West Sunrise Boulevard Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33309 / US | 02 /
Turney, William J 1426 Chatham Lane Schaumburg, Illinois 60196 / US | 03 /
Gailus, Paul H. 500 Grego Court Prospect Heights, Illinois 60070 / US | 04 /
Clark, Edward T 7220 N.W. 11th Court Plantation, Florida 33313 / US | 05 /
Dorevitch, Joshua E. 2751 W. Greenleaf Chicago, Illinois 60645 / US | 06 /
Mansfield, Terry K. 850 South Cedar Street Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/33] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property Section, Law Department, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04100346.8 | 14.10.1999 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | US19980174628 | 19.10.1998 Original published format: US 174628 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1445871 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1445871 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/28 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H04B1/005 (EP,US);
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H04B1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/33] | Title | German: | Im Passband arbeitender, integrierter Mehrmoden-sigma-delta-Empfänger mit Interferenzverringerung und Verfahren zur dessen Anwendung | [2004/33] | English: | Integrated multi-mode bandpass sigma-delta receiver subsystem with interference mitigation and method of using same | [2004/33] | French: | Sous systeme de récepteur multimode sigma-delta dans la bande passante à limitation d'interférence et son procédé d'utilisation | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99970816.7 / EP1123609 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2007 | BE | 14.02.2007 | CH | 14.02.2007 | CY | 14.02.2007 | DK | 14.02.2007 | LI | 14.02.2007 | NL | 14.02.2007 | GR | 15.05.2007 | PT | 16.07.2007 | LU | 14.10.2007 | IE | 15.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
CY | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
GR | 15.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
BE | 14.02.2007 | ||
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 14.02.2007 | |
CH | 14.02.2007 | ||
DK | 14.02.2007 | ||
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 14.02.2007 | |
LI | 14.02.2007 | ||
NL | 14.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8701531 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 29, line 12 - line 14 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5345409 (MCGRATH DONALD T [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 12, line 3 - line 12 *; | [Y]EP0650261 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 35 - line 38 *; | [Y]US5541600 (BLUMENKRANTZ ENRIQUE M [CH], et al) [Y] 3,4,8 * figure 1 * * figures 3,17 *; | [Y]US5557642 (WILLIAMS TIM A [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * column 1, line 12 - line 15 * * column 5, line 16 - line 19 * * column 5, line 27 - line 31 * * column 6, line 3 - line 7 * * column 6, line 31 - line 38 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US5561425 (THERSSEN DIETER ERNEST MICHEL [NL]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5619536 (GOURGUE FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - line 46 * * column 2, line 39 - line 52 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5621345 (LEE WAI L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - line 46 ** figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5646621 (CABLER CARLIN DRU [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 1 - line 6 * * column 5, line 23 - line 26 * * column 24, line 31 - line 36 * * figures 1,39 *; | [Y]US5689440 (LEITCH CLIFFORD DANA [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 9 *; | [A]US5736848 (DE VRIES JACOB [CH], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 47 - line 57 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5821890 (KIM DAEJONG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A] - BOEHM K ET AL, "An IF digitizing receiver for a combined GPS/GSM terminal", RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, 1998. RAWCON 98. 1998 IEEE COLORADO SPRINGS, CO, USA 9-12 AUG. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980809), ISBN 0-7803-4988-1, pages 39 - 42, XP010296327 [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 20 - line 22 * * column 6, line 1 - line 11 * * figures 1,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RAWCON.1998.709131 |