EP1471268 - Fracture bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirtenberger Automotive Safety GmbH & Co KG Leobersdorfer Strasse 31-33 2552 Hirtenberg / AT | [2006/34] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Hirtenberger Automotive Safety GmbH Leobersdorferstrasse 31-33 2552 Hirtenberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marker, Ludwig Florianigasse 21 2560, Grillenberg / AT | 02 /
Schalko, Karl, Ing. Dreikreuzstrasse 41 3163, Unterrohrbach / AT | 03 /
Aigner, Kurt Testarellogasse 6/4/14 1130, Wien / AT | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Martin Müllner, Markus Speringer Postfach 169 Weihburggasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/44] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04100520.8 | 11.02.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | AT20030000284U | 23.04.2003 Original published format: AT 28403 U | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471268 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471268 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B31/00, F42B3/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F42B3/006 (EP);
F16B31/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Trennschraube | [2004/44] | English: | Fracture bolt | [2004/44] | French: | Boulon à rupture | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | CZ | 16.08.2006 | EE | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | IT | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | RO | 16.08.2006 | SI | 16.08.2006 | SK | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | BG | 16.11.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | LU | 11.02.2007 | HU | 17.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 16.08.2006 | |
CZ | 16.08.2006 | ||
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
LU | 11.02.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
EE | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
RO | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SK | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SI | 16.08.2006 | ||
BG | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3994201 (BENDLER HELLMUT, et al); | [X]DE29521679U (RHEINMETALL IND AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO0034094 (GIAT IND SA [FR], et al) [A] * page 12, line 4 - page 14, line 10; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE10127483 (ACTS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |