EP1566600 - Desiccant unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2005/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlot, Hervé 53, rue des Graminées 57100 Thionville / FR | 02 /
Houver, Claude 13, rue des Tulipes 57570 Boust / FR | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Ocvirk, Philippe, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Ocvirk, Philippe, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 04100691.7 | 20.02.2004 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1566600 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
F25B43/003 (EP);
F25B2339/0441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/20] |
Former [2005/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trockenpatrone | [2005/34] | English: | Desiccant unit | [2005/34] | French: | Cartouche déshydratante | [2005/34] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 24.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02154958 ; | [A]GB632000 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]US2714964 (RADFORD PAUL S) [A] 6 * column 2, lines 12-41; figure 1 *; | [DY]US4013566 (TAYLOR R DANIEL) [DY] 7-12 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 2 * * column 2, lines 45-68; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5593477 (ELSON EDWARD E [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, lines 22-32; figure 10 * * column 3, lines 26-29; figure 4 *; | [A]US5650030 (KYRICOS CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 12; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2836211 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] * abstract *; | [Y]EP1387134 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] - [0021]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [AL] - AARON L.BRODY, "Multi-Component Plastics : Smart Polymers for Smart Packaging", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200401), URL: http:\\www.ift.org\publications\docshop\ft_shop\01-04\01_04_pdfs\01-04-packaging.pdf, (20040727), XP002290233 [AL] 2 * page 64, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 65, column 2, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900831), vol. 014, no. 404, Database accession no. (M - 1018), & JP02154958 A 19900614 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * page 4 * * abstract * | by applicant | US4013566 |