EP1462622 - Multi-cylinder engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukui, Takaaki Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
Sato, Toshiyuki Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nojima, Satoru Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/40] | Poulin, Gérard, et al c/o Brevalex, 3, rue du docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04101001.8 | 11.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030085245 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003085245 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462622 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462622 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F02D13/06 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F01L1/022 (EP,US);
F01L1/143 (EP,US);
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0537 (EP,US);
F01L2301/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrzylinderbrennkraftmaschine | [2004/40] | English: | Multi-cylinder engine | [2004/40] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne à plusieurs cylindres | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 28.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2013/49] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000205038 ; | [A]US5361734 (SHIRAI EIJI [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, lines 26-30; figures 2,3,6 * * column 2, lines 48-50; figures 1-3,6 *; | [X]US5490486 (DIGGS MATTHEW B [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]EP0703357 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]US5758612 (TSUZUKU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 10, lines 21-24 * * column 2 * * column 18, lines 35-41; figures 1-8,16,22 *; | US6318316 [ ] (TSUKUI TAKAAKI [JP], et al) | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000205038 A 20000725 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document * |