EP1463161 - Plug-in fuse-mounting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28 Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Takuro Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1 Nunobikibara Haibara- Haibara-gun / JP | 02 /
Ohashi, Norihiro Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1 Nunobikibara Haibara- Haibara-gun / JP | 03 /
Totsuka, Mitsuhiko Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 206-1 Nunobikibara Haibara- Haibara-gun / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04101204.8 | 24.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030080425 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003080425 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463161 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/68, H01R13/645 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H01R13/68 (EP,US);
H01R13/6456 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Montageanordnung für Aufsteckschmelzsicherung | [2004/40] | English: | Plug-in fuse-mounting structure | [2004/40] | French: | Structure de montage pour fusible embrochable | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 01.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5629663 (SEKI YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 45 - line 47 *; | [A]US5883561 (NAKAMURA GORO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5886612 (BECKERT JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-4* column 3, line 57 - line 67 *; | [Y]DE4447731 (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 5 *; | [DY]US2001043139 (ENDO TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [DY] 1-4 * the whole document * |