EP1475074 - Verwendung von Polycarbonsäuren und deren Salzen als Komplexbildner in oxidierenden Zusammensetzungen zum Färben, Entfärben und zur dauerhaften Verformung von Keratinfasern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGRAND, Frédéric 3, avenue du Château du Loir 92400, COURBEVOIE / FR | 02 /
MILLEQUANT, Jean-Marie 144, rue Garibaldi 94100, SAINT MAUR DES FOSSES / FR | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/46] | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04101243.6 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | FR20030050064 | 25.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0350064 | FR20030050078 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: FR 0350078 | [2004/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475074 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/09, A61K7/13, A61K7/135 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A61K8/22 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/442 (EP);
A61Q5/04 (EP);
A61Q5/08 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K2800/51 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Use of polycarboxylic acids and their salts as complexing agents in oxidizing compositions for dyeing, bleaching or permanently setting keratin fibers | [2004/46] | English: | Verwendung von Polycarbonsäuren und deren Salzen als Komplexbildner in oxidierenden Zusammensetzungen zum Färben, Entfärben und zur dauerhaften Verformung von Keratinfasern | [2004/46] | French: | Utilisation d'acides polycarboxyliques et de leurs sels comme agents complexants dans des compositions oxydantes pour la coloration, la décoloration ou la déformation permanente de fibres kératiniques | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 26.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 03.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0509382 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1,15-30 * claims 1,6,10; table I *; | [A]US5621008 (PTCHELINTSEV DMITRI [US]) [A] 15 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5786313 (SCHNEIDER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,15-30 * claim 1; table 1 *; | JPH1192794 [ ] (KAO CORP); | [A]US2002127194 (NGUYEN LY-LAN [FR], et al) [A] 1,15-30 * example 1 *; | [A]US2003032573 (TANNER PAUL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,15-30 * claims 1,2,13 *; | [A]WO03015732 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 12, paragraph L; claims 1,35,46,90 *; | [A] - KANEKO, YOHEI ET AL, "Biodegradable cleaning compositions with good disinfecting properties for skin and hair", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:316420, URL: STN, XP002262925 [A] 1,15-30 * abstract * | Examination | WO9721797 | DE10032589 | WO02074273 | WO02074272 |