EP1588882 - Drive unit for movable parts of a vehicle roof assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inalfa Roof Systems Group B.V. Smakterweg 70 5804 AH Venray / NL | [2005/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nellen, Marcel, Johan, Christiaan Kamperfoelie 51 5803 HL, Venray / NL | 02 /
Van den Berge, Rob, Wietse Herman Boerhaavelaan 94 7415 EX, Deventer / NL | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Metman, Karel Johannes De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 04101603.1 | 19.04.2004 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1588882 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588882 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/057, F16H37/08 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B60J7/0573 (EP);
F16H37/0813 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebseinheit für beweglichen Teile einer Dachanordnung für ein Fahrzeug | [2005/43] | English: | Drive unit for movable parts of a vehicle roof assembly | [2005/43] | French: | Unité d'entrainement de parties mobiles d'un toit ouvrant de véhicule | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 27.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4318481 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, lines 56-60 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2001035062 (SCHUTT THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,2,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]DE10238440 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2,8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * |