EP1475063 - Wheel Chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states movingpeople.net Nederland B.V. Vossenbeemd 104 5705 CL Helmond / NL | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schepers, Fransiscus Antonius Gerardus movingpeople.net Nederland B.V. Vossembeemd 104 5705 CL, Helmond / NL | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04101793.0 | 28.04.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | NL20031023378 | 09.05.2003 Original published format: NL 1023378 | [2004/46] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475063 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475063 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/10 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A61G5/042 (EP);
A61G5/10 (EP);
A61G5/1089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/30] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rollstuhl | [2004/46] | English: | Wheel Chair | [2004/46] | French: | Fauteuil roulant | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 11.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4500102 (HAURY GILBERT E [US], et al) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4592570 (NASSIRI JOE-MASSOUD [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9217764U (ULRICH ALBER) [A] 1,8 * page 5, line 1 - line 29; figure - *; | [A]US5320412 (EAKINS RICHARD [CA], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 48 - line 63 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 53; figure 3 *; | [A]US5564512 (SCHEULDERMAN PETRUS J [NL]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9802122 (DEKA PRODUCTS LP [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * page 2, line 6 - line 10 * * page 5, line 8 - line 10; figure - * | by applicant | US4500102 |