EP1493387 - Grid for use in CT-guided biopsy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Radi Medical Devices AB Palmbladsgatan 10 751 55 Uppsala / SE | [2009/07] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states RADI MEDICAL SYSTEMS AB Palmbladsgatan 10 754 50 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aström, Gunnar Geijersgatan 35 A 752 31 UPPSALA / SE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04101986.0 | 07.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | SE20030001977 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: SE 0301977 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1493387 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1493387 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B19/00, A61M5/42 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61M5/427 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3954 (EP,US);
A61B2090/397 (EP,US);
A61B6/037 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Gitter zur Verwendung in CT-geführter Biopsie | [2005/01] | English: | Grid for use in CT-guided biopsy | [2005/01] | French: | Grille pour l'utilisation dans une biopse guidée par CT | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/17] | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3547121 (CHERRY SHELDON H) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5260985 (MOSBY RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,2,7* abstract *; | [X]DE10027275 (CARMANNS BRUNO [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figure a *; | [X]WO02059571 (NAGLE MICHAEL G [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 12-14 * |