EP1484866 - Selective pre-authentication to anticipated primary wireless access points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barkley, Warren V. 2615 161st Place, SE Millcreek, Washington 98012 / US | 02 /
Ayyagari, Arun 4912 NE 88th Street Seattle Washington 98115 / US | 03 /
Moore, Timothy M. 1223 167th Avenue, SE Bellevue Washington 98008 / US | 04 /
Baron, Andrew Thomas 9935 229th Lane, NE Redmond Washington 98053 / US | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04102063.7 | 12.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | US20030453762 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: US 453762 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484866 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484866 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04Q7/38, H04L29/06 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (KR);
H04L12/06 (KR);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04W12/062 (EP,US);
H04L65/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Selektive Vorauthentifizierung zu den vorzeitigen primären drahtlosen Zugangspunkten | [2007/15] | English: | Selective pre-authentication to anticipated primary wireless access points | [2004/50] | French: | Pré-authentification sélective avec des points d'accès primaires anticipés sans fil | [2007/15] |
Former [2004/50] | Selektive Vorauthentifizierung an vorhergesehenen primären drahtlosen Zugangspunkten | ||
Former [2004/50] | Pre-authentification selective avec des points d'accès primaires anticipés sans fil | Examination procedure | 01.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 24.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2007 | BE | 24.10.2007 | CH | 24.10.2007 | CY | 24.10.2007 | CZ | 24.10.2007 | DK | 24.10.2007 | EE | 24.10.2007 | FI | 24.10.2007 | LI | 24.10.2007 | NL | 24.10.2007 | PL | 24.10.2007 | RO | 24.10.2007 | SI | 24.10.2007 | SK | 24.10.2007 | TR | 24.10.2007 | BG | 24.01.2008 | SE | 24.01.2008 | GR | 25.01.2008 | ES | 04.02.2008 | PT | 24.03.2008 | HU | 25.04.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
HU | 25.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02091679 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [XY]US2003016655 (GWON YOUNGJUNE L [US]); | [A]EP1289223 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); |