EP1493383 - Method of positioning electrodes for central nervous system monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTRUMENTARIUM CORPORATION Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Särkelä, Mika Santavuorentie 7 A 2 00400, Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Viertiö-Oja, Hanna Hempontie 6 B 02660, Espoo / FI | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/01] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04102678.2 | 14.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030612828 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 612828 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1493383 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1493383 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0478, A61B5/0492, A61B5/0496 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/1106 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/398 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Positionierung von Elektroden zur Überwachung des Zentralnervensystems | [2005/01] | English: | Method of positioning electrodes for central nervous system monitoring | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé de positionnement d'électrodes pour la surveillance du système nerveux central | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2010 | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/49] | 31.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 14.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05161621 ; | [X]WO9302616 (SRD SHORASHIM MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al) [X] 11-17 * page 22, line 12 - page 23, line 12 * * figure 7B *; | [X]US5291888 (TUCKER DON M [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 7, lines 45-50 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5491492 (KNAPP R BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 11-16 * column 5, lines 31-63 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO0200096 (PHYSIOMETRIX INC [US]) [X] 11-17 * figures 1,4 *; | [DA]US6394953 (DEVLIN PHILIP H [US], et al) [DA] 1-23 * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 27 * * figures 15,17 *; | [A]US2003055355 (VIERTIO-OJA HANNA ELINA [FI]) [A] 1-10* figure 15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931008), vol. 0175, no. 61, Database accession no. (C - 1119), & JP5161621 A 19930629 (SAILOR PEN CO LTD:THE) [X] 1-23 * abstract * |