EP1493489 - Cyclone separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greif, Volker Am Tabakschuppen 3 67376, Harthausen / DE | 02 /
Kissel, Günther Freiherr-von-Stein-Strasse 64 67435, Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Zink, Jan Richard-Wagner-Strasse 1 68519, Viernheim / DE | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 04102861.4 | 22.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE2003130296 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330296 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493489 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B04C3/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B04C3/04 (EP,US);
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
F02M35/022 (EP,US);
B04C2003/006 (EP,US);
F02M35/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Zyklonabscheidevorrichtung | [2005/01] | English: | Cyclone separator | [2005/01] | French: | Séparateur cyclonique | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/45] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/45] | Request for further processing for: | 13.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1420807 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 88 - page 4, line 82 * * figures 5-8 * [Y] 6; | [X]US4289611 (BROCKMANN HEINZ) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 5 - line 9 * * column 1, line 58 - line 68 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 50 * * figure . *; | [Y]US4746340 (DURRE REYNOLD F [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 17 - line 21 * * figures 3,4,6 *; | [A]DE3826454 (LOREY MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 * |