EP1501298 - Method and apparatus of identifying a telecine portion and bad-edits in a video sequence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Young-ho 302, 12-5, Seokchon-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
YANG, Seung-joon 109-2101, Samsung Raemian Apartment, Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2005/04] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04102871.3 | 22.06.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | KR20030049909 | 21.07.2003 Original published format: KR 2003049909 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1501298 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1501298 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H04N7/0115 (EP,US);
H04N5/253 (KR);
H04N7/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/41] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Identifizieren von Fernsehkinoanteilen und Editierfehlern in einer Videosequenz | [2005/04] | English: | Method and apparatus of identifying a telecine portion and bad-edits in a video sequence | [2005/04] | French: | Procédé et dispositif servant à identifier une partie de vidéo convertie en télécinéma et des défauts d'édition | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/43] | IT | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9739577 (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,16[A] 2,3,6,7,11-15,17-19; | [X]US6509933 (HONDA HIROFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-19 * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 3 * * column 5, line 9 - column 8, line 55; figure 2 * |