EP1492203 - Connector Assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, James Dewayne / 935 Lisa Drive Waterloo, Iowa 50701 / US | 02 /
Formwalt, Charles William / 2739 Bluebird Avenue Janesville, Iowa 50647 / US | 03 /
Sabelka, James Edward Box 546, 220 Donna Street Denver, Iowa 50622 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
Davis, James Dewayne 935 Lisa Drive 50701, Waterloo / US | ||
02 /
Formwalt, Charles William 2739 Bluebird Avenue 50647, Janesville / US | |||
03 /
Sabelka, James Edward Box 546 220 Donna Street 50622, Denver / US | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Holst, Sönke, et al Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Holst, Sönke, Dr., et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04102886.1 | 22.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030601743 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: US 601743 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492203 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1492203 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492203 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/62933 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/39] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungseinrichtung | [2005/01] | English: | Connector Assembly | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif de connection | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 27.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2278507 (MECANISMOS AUX IND [ES]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 5 *; | [A]US5709561 (CADORET YVES [FR], et al); | [A]EP1083637 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]); | [A]US2002177348 (KARAMATSU MASAYUKI [JP], et al) |