EP1494391 - Automatic configuration of a DHCP-compatible access router, for specific handling of the IP-dataflows from a client terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Exploitant Autonome de Droit Public 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Exploitant Autonome de Droit Public 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM Exploitant Autonome de Droit Public, 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinel, Romain 4, impasse Hent Bihan 22560 Trebeurden / FR | 02 /
Battello, Fabien Résidence de l'Océan, 3, boulevard Clémenceau 22700 Perros Guirec / FR | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Windal-Vercasson, Gaelle I.M. Orange R&D/PIV/BREVETS 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92794 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Windal-Vercasson, Gaelle I.M. France Telecom R&D/PIV/BREVETS 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc 92794 Issy Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2008/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/01] | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04103114.7 | 01.07.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | FR20030050296 | 04.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0350296 | [2005/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494391 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494391 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/28 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04L41/0856 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Automatische Konfiguration eines, mit DHCP kompatibelen Zugangsrouters, zur spezifischen Abfertigung der IP-Datenströme eines Terminals | [2005/01] | English: | Automatic configuration of a DHCP-compatible access router, for specific handling of the IP-dataflows from a client terminal | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé de configuration automatique d'un routeur d'accès, compatible avec le protocole DHCP, pour effectuer un traitement automatique spécifique des flux IP d'un terminal client | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2010 | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IE | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | LU | 01.07.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | BE | 31.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
LU | 01.07.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
CY | 03.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 03.03.2010 | |
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 03.03.2010 | |
SI | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6223222 (FIJOLEK JOHN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 55 * * column 29, line 53 - column 30, line 18 * * column 32, line 10 - line 20 * * column 37, line 37 - column 38, line 62 * * column 39, line 36 - column 40, line 31 * * column 41, line 4 - line 38 * [A] 6-14; | [A]US2002046263 (CAMERINI JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] ** paragraphs [0021] - [0032] *; | [YA]US2003101243 (DONAHUE DAVID B [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0085] * * paragraphs [0153] - [0155] * [A] 6-14; | [A]US2003101217 (AIYOSHI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * paragraphs [0153] - [0155] * | by applicant | US6223222 |