EP1536660 - Communication system, communication units, and method of ambience listening thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Solutions, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg IL 60196 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vered, Aryeh Motorola Israel Limited 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
Or-Shraga, Boaz Motorola Israel Limited 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
Cherniak, Michael Motorola Israel Limited 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | [2013/43] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
Vered, Aryeh Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
02 /
Or-Shraga, Boaz Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
Cherniak, Michael Motorola Israel Limited, 3 Kremenetsky Street 67899 Tel Aviv / IL | Representative(s) | Treleven, Colin, et al Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Treleven, Colin, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke Hampshire, RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Treleven, Colin, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04104184.9 | 01.09.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | GB20030027507 | 27.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0327507 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1536660 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1536660 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536660 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H04W76/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem, Kommunikationseinheiten und Verfahren zum Umgebungsmithören | [2005/22] | English: | Communication system, communication units, and method of ambience listening thereto | [2005/22] | French: | Système de communication, unités de communication et procédé d'attente d'entourage | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2004 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.09.2004 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5589818 (QUEEN ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,14-18,21 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 20 * * column 4, line 42 - column 4, line 48 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 10 * [Y] 4,5,9-13,19,20; | [Y]US6504926 (EDELSON STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,9-13,19,20 * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 34 - column 4, line 62 *; | [A] - "ETSI EN 300 392-10-21 V1.2.1 (2003-09) Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 10: Supplementary services stage 1; Sub-part 21: Ambience Listening (AL)", Sophia Antipolis - France, (200309), URL: http://webapp.etsi.org/exchangefolder/en_3003921021v010201p.pdf, (20080212), XP002468889 [A] 1-21 * page 9, paragraph 4.1.1 - page 9, paragraph 4.1.2 * * page 10, paragraph 4.2.2.2.1 * | [A] - "Motorola MTM700 product brochure", (200308), URL: http://developer.motorola.com/docstools/productbrochures/mtm700_Brochure.pdf/, (20080213), XP002468890 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5589818 |