EP1517368 - Protection of a SiC surface via a GaN-layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 29-33, rue de la Fédération BP 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUDIN, Bruno 37, chemin du Coteau 38700, LA TRONCHE / FR | 02 /
BRAULT, Julien 13, rue Saint Fulbert Bâtiment D 69008, LYON / FR | [2011/44] |
Former [2005/12] | 01 /
DAUDIN, Bruno 37, chemin du Coteau 38700, LA TRONCHE / FR | ||
02 /
BRAULT, Julien 13, rue Saint Fulbert Bâtiment D 69008, LYON / FR | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/12] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04104539.4 | 20.09.2004 | [2005/12] | Priority number, date | FR20030050585 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: FR 0350585 | [2005/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1517368 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1517368 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1517368 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/29, H01L21/20 | [2005/12] | CPC: |
H01L23/298 (EP,US);
C30B29/36 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/12] | Title | German: | Schutz einer SiC-Oberfläche mittels einer GaN-Schicht | [2005/12] | English: | Protection of a SiC surface via a GaN-layer | [2005/12] | French: | Protection de la surface du SiC par une couche de GaN | [2005/12] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 12.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2004 | AT | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | IE | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JOHNSON M A L ET AL, "MBE growth and properties of GaN on GaN/SiC substrates", SOLID STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (19970201), vol. 41, no. 2, ISSN 0038-1101, pages 213 - 218, XP004033811 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0038-1101(96)00169-4 | [DA] - K.H. PLOOG, O. BRANDT, R. MURALIDHARAN, A. THAMM, P. WALTEREIT, "Growth of high quality (Al,Ga)N and (Ga,In)N heterostructures on SiC(0001) by both plasma-assisted and reactive molecular beam epitaxy", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY B, (200007), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 2290 - 2294, XP002284692 [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2290, column R, line 8, paragraph 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.1305288 | [DA] - L. X. ZHENG, M.H. XIE, S.Y. TONG, "Adsorption and desorption kinetics of gallium atoms on 6H-SiC(0001) surfaces", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, (20010215), vol. 61, no. 7, pages 4890 - 4893, XP002284693 [DA] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevB.61.4890 |