EP1641208 - Apparatus and Method for Integrating Authentication Protocols in the Establishment of Connections between Computing Devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states RESEARCH IN MOTION LIMITED 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Little, Herbert A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | 02 /
Robertson, Ian M. 209 Bristol Street N2J 1H4, Waterloo, Ontario / CA | 03 /
Brown, Michael K. / 8 Fernwood Place N2M 2Z2, Kitchener, Ontario / CA | 04 /
Kirkup, Michael G. / 413 Exmoor Street N2K 3X5, Waterloo / CA | 05 /
Hammell, Jonathan F. R. R. 1 Dobbinton, Ontario N0H 1LO / CA | [2011/45] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
Little, Herbert A. 504 Old Oak Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V8 / CA | ||
02 /
Robertson, Ian M. 209 Bristol Street N2J 1H4, Waterloo, Ontario / CA | |||
03 /
Brown, Michael K. 8 Fernwood Place N2M 2Z2, Kitchener, Ontario / CA | |||
04 /
Kirkup, Michael G. 413 Exmoor Street N2K 3X5, Waterloo / CA | |||
05 /
Hammell, Jonathan F. R. R. #1 Dobbinton, Ontario N0H 1LO / CA | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | Rickard, David John, et al 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04104589.9 | 22.09.2004 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641208 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641208 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G06F21/41 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/082 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | 22.09.2004 | HR | 22.09.2004 | LT | 22.09.2004 | LV | 22.09.2004 | MK | 22.09.2004 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Integrieren Authentisierungsprotokolle in den Aufbau von Verbindungen zwischen Rechnergeräten | [2006/13] | English: | Apparatus and Method for Integrating Authentication Protocols in the Establishment of Connections between Computing Devices | [2006/13] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'integration de protocoles d'authentification dans l'établissement des liaisons entre des dispositifs informatiques | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 11.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2004 | AT | 09.11.2011 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | IT | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.11.2011 | |
BE | 09.11.2011 | ||
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 09.11.2011 | |
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 09.11.2011 | |
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0940960 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X]WO0239237 (IBM [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 12, line 12 - line 28 * * page 16, line 1 - page 18, line 3 * * page 22, line 8 - page 25, line 16 * * page 26, line 17 - page 27, line 31 *; | [X]US2003135734 (FAGAN ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038] ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057] * |