EP1519195 - Methods for reducing albumin in samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/13] | Apparatuses and methods for reducing albumin in samples | ||
[2011/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galbraith, William 78 Suomi Street Paxton, MA 01612 / US | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Weber, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Weber, Thomas, Dr., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04104644.2 | 24.09.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | US20030506634P | 25.09.2003 Original published format: US 506634 P | US20030506579P | 26.09.2003 Original published format: US 506579 P | US20030531377P | 19.12.2003 Original published format: US 531377 P | US20040804592 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: US 804592 | US20040922560 | 19.08.2004 Original published format: US 922560 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519195 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519195 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519195 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/96 (EP,US);
G01N2333/765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung von Eiweiss in Proben | [2011/27] | English: | Methods for reducing albumin in samples | [2011/27] | French: | Procédés permettant de réduire la présence d'albumine dans les échantillons | [2011/44] |
Former [2005/13] | Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Verminderung von Eiweiss in Proben | ||
Former [2005/13] | Apparatuses and methods for reducing albumin in samples | ||
Former [2005/13] | Appareils et procédés permettant de réduire la présence d'albumine dans les échantillons | Examination procedure | 22.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2004 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4093612 (TRAVIS JAMES, et al) [X] 13-17,38 * column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 58 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line L; examples 1-5; claim 1 * [Y] 1-12,20-27,32-34,37; | [Y]EP0469519 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12,18-27,32-37,39-49 * column 3, line 23 - line 26; claims 1,8 *; | [X] - WOLKOFF A W ET AL, "Purification of ligandin by affinity chromatography on sulfobromophthalein-agarose gel.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE. SOCIETY FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE (NEW YORK, N. Y.) FEB 1979, (197902), vol. 160, no. 2, ISSN 0037-9727, pages 150 - 153, XP008040124 [X] 1-8,13,20,22,24-27 * page 150, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1; table 1 * | [DXY] - TRAVIS J ET AL, "Isolation of albumin from whole human plasma and fractionation of albumin-depleted plasma.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL. 1 AUG 1976, (19760801), vol. 157, no. 2, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 301 - 306, XP008040119 [DX] 13-17,38 * page 302, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4 * [Y] 18,19 | [YA] - STEEL LAURA F ET AL, "Efficient and specific removal of albumin from human serum samples.", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS : MCP. APR 2003, (200304), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1535-9476, pages 262 - 270, XP002309638 [Y] 32-37 * page 263, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 1 * [A] 7-12,24-31 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Montage Albumin Deplete Kit", MILLIPORE DATA SHEET, (2002), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.millipore.com/publications.nsf/dda0cb48c91c0fb6852567430063b5d6/93fb149395b1e8df85256c0d003d41a0/$FILE/PF1770EN00.pdf, (20041208), XP002309532 [Y] 39-49 * the whole document * | Examination | - "Epoxy-activated Sepharose 6B", AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES, SWEDEN, pages 1 - 12 | - STREMMEL W. ET AL, "Physicochemical and immunohistological studies of a sulfobromophthalein- and bilirubin-binding protein from rat liver plasma membranes", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (1983), vol. 71, pages 1796 - 1805 | - REICHEN J.; BERK P.D., "Isolation of an organic anion binding protein from rat liver plasma membrane fractions by affinity chromatography", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1979), vol. 91, no. 2, pages 484 - 489, XP024834968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(79)91547-X |