EP1522877 - Sturdy container for linear underwater antennae [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | [2005/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borel, Christophe THALES Intellectual Property 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 ARCUEIL / FR | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Laurent Jacques Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Lucas, Laurent Jacques THALES Intellectual Property, 31-33 avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04104807.5 | 30.09.2004 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | FR20030011898 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: FR 0311898 | [2005/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522877 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/20, H05K5/02 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
G01V1/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Strapazierfähiger Behälter für lineare Unterwasserantennen | [2005/15] | English: | Sturdy container for linear underwater antennae | [2005/15] | French: | Container résistant adapté aux antennes linéaires sous-marines | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 09.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2071487 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 3 ** page 5, line 1 - line 5; figure 4 *; | [A]US3939464 (SWENSON RICHARD C) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 43 - line 61; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US4693335 (ALMON HAROLD A [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 10 - line 15; figure 3 *; | [A]USH462H (ZIBILICH ANTHONY M) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 16 - line 53; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9423313 (GEC MARCONI SYSTEMS PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 7 - line 21 * * page 11, line 4 - line 16; figure 5 * |