EP1526059 - Steering Column Module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simonis, Karl Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Flemingstrasse 6 75428, Illingen / DE | 02 /
Lipfert, Rainer Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Rampachertal 10 74076, Heilbronn / DE | 03 /
Hasch, Martin Valeo Schalter und Sensoren Clara-Schumann-Str. 34 71701, Schwieberdingen / DE | 04 /
Grüner, Roland Valeo Schalter und Sensoren Hauptstrasse 66 71732, Tamm / DE | 05 /
Binder, Bernd Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Walter-Kriebel-Weg 1 D-74372 Sersheim / DE | 06 /
Suchanek, Jürgen Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Heilbronner Str. 60 74363, Güglingen / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Vötsch, Reiner Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH VIC-E-IP Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Vötsch, Reiner Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH VIC-E-IP Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Valeo Switches & Detection Systems (VSDS) Service Propriété Industrielle Rue Jules Verne - Vetraz Monthoux, B.P. 509 74106 Annemasse Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04104876.0 | 05.10.2004 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | DE2003150291 | 23.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10350291 | [2005/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526059 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526059 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526059 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
B62D1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | Lenkstockmodul | [2005/17] | English: | Steering Column Module | [2005/17] | French: | Module de commande sous volant | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.02.2010 | CZ | 10.02.2010 | DK | 10.02.2010 | EE | 10.02.2010 | FI | 10.02.2010 | IE | 10.02.2010 | NL | 10.02.2010 | PL | 10.02.2010 | RO | 10.02.2010 | SI | 10.02.2010 | SK | 10.02.2010 | TR | 10.02.2010 | BG | 10.05.2010 | GR | 11.05.2010 | ES | 21.05.2010 | PT | 11.06.2010 | HU | 11.08.2010 | AT | 05.10.2010 | GB | 05.10.2010 | LU | 05.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
HU | 11.08.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.10.2010 | ||
LU | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
HU | 11.08.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
AT | 05.10.2010 | ||
GB | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
GB | 05.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
DK | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
BG | 10.05.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 10.02.2010 | |
CZ | 10.02.2010 | ||
EE | 10.02.2010 | ||
FI | 10.02.2010 | ||
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
RO | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
SK | 10.02.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 10.02.2010 | |
IE | 10.02.2010 | ||
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
GR | 11.05.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 10.02.2010 | |
NL | 10.02.2010 | ||
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 10.02.2010 | |
PL | 10.02.2010 | ||
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 10.02.2010 | |
SI | 10.02.2010 | ||
ES | 21.05.2010 | ||
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | ES | 21.05.2010 | |
PT | 11.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 21.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9843855 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [X]EP1065107 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19942818 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1319573 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |