EP1523934 - Sensor arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Finland Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Finland Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states Instrumentarium International Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states INSTRUMENTARIUM CORPORATION Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoskonen, Terho Ilmajoenkuja 12 04430, Järvenpää / FI | 02 /
Kamppari, Lasse Raisiontie 5 A 12 00280, Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Kymäläinen, Minna Messeniuksenkatu 7 B 26 00250, Helsinki / FI | 04 /
Kall, Magnus Kuunsäde 6 C 53 02210, Espoo / FI | 05 /
Pesu, Leena Suolakivenkatu 20 A 1 00810 Helsinki / FI | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/16] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04104961.0 | 11.10.2004 | [2005/16] | Priority number, date | US20030688863 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 688863 | [2005/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1523934 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1523934 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04, A61B5/05, A61B5/0205 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/6841 (EP,US);
A61B5/1106 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/16] | Title | German: | Sensoranordnung | [2005/16] | English: | Sensor arrangement | [2005/16] | French: | Agencement de capteur | [2005/16] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2010 | BE | 08.12.2010 | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IT | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.12.2010 | |
BE | 08.12.2010 | ||
CY | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4595018 (RANTALA BOERJE [FI]) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 37 - line 52; claim 1 *; | [A]US4595013 (JONES RANDOLPH W [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * claim 1 *; | [A]US6394953 (DEVLIN PHILIP H [US], et al) [A] 1-32* the whole document *; | [A]US2003009096 (LAHTEENMAKI MARKKU [FI]) [A] 1-32 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; claim 1 *; | [XY]WO03057030 (MASIMO CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,27 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 10; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 11 | by applicant | US4595018 | WO0232305 | US2003009096 | WO03057030 | - MARKKU P.J. ET AL., JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MONITORING, (198810), vol. 4, no. 4 |