EP1650236 - Activating agents for hafnium based metallocene components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busico, Vincenzo Via Cintia, Parco S. Paolo 34 I-80126, Napoli / IT | 02 /
Cipullo, Roberta Via G. Jannelli 390 I-80131, Napoli / IT | 03 /
Pellecchia, Roberta Via G. Jannelli 23 I-80128, Napoli / IT | 04 /
Razavi, Abbas Domaine de la Brisée, 35 B-7000, Mons / BE | [2006/17] | Application number, filing date | 04105219.2 | 21.10.2004 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650236 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F110/06, C08F4/642 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/642 (KR);
C08F4/76 (US);
C07F17/00 (KR);
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08F4/649 (US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/6592 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F4/65927 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aktivierungsmittel zur Verwendung mit Metallocen-Bestandteilen auf Hafnium basierend | [2006/17] | English: | Activating agents for hafnium based metallocene components | [2006/17] | French: | Agents d'activation pour des composés de l'hafnium du type métallocène | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0387691 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example 5 *; | [A]EP0399347 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 9 - page 11 *; | [X]EP0985673 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,7-11,13,14 * examples 11,14 *; | [X]WO0190205 (BASELL TECHNOLOGY CO BV [NL], et al) [X] 13,14 * tables 1,2 *; | [T]EP1496070 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [T] 1-14 * page 8 - page 11 ** figure 2 *; | [X] - KISSIN, YURY V. KISSIN, YURY V., "Catalyst systems for alkene polymerization based on metallocene complexes and sterically hindered organoaluminates Catalyst systems for alkene polymerization based on metallocene complexes and sterically hindered organoaluminates", MACROMOLECULES , 36(20), 7413-7421 CODEN: MAMOBX; ISSN: 0024-9297 MACROMOLECULES , 36(20), 7413-7421 CODEN: MAMOBX; ISSN: 0024-9297, (2003), XP008044597 [X] 1,7-11,13,14 * page 7416 - page 7417; examples IV-H; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma0345854 | [A] - RAZAVI, ABBAS ET AL, "Preparation and crystal structures of the cyclopentadienylfluorenyldiphenylmethane zirconium and hafnium complexes (.eta.5-C5H4CPh2-.eta.5-C13H8)MCl2 (M = Zr, Hf) and the catalytic formation of high molecular weight high tacticity syndiotactic polypropylene", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 459(1-2), 117-23 CODEN: JORCAI; ISSN: 0022-328X, (1993), XP008044603 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(93)86062-M | [A] - RAZAVI, ABBAS ET AL RAZAVI, ABBAS ET AL, "Preparation and crystal structures of the complexes (.eta.5-C5H3Me-CMe2-.eta.5-C13H8)MCl2 (M = Zr or Hf): mechanistic aspects of the catalytic formation of a syndiotactic-isotactic stereoblock-type polypropylene", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 497(1-2), 105-11 CODEN: JORCAI; ISSN: 0022-328X JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 497(1-2), 105-11 CODEN: JORCAI; ISSN: 0022-328X, (1995), XP004023847 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-328X(95)00115-7 | [A] - RAZAVI, A. ET AL RAZAVI, A. ET AL, "Preparation and crystal structures of the complexes (.eta.5-C5H3TMS-CMe2-.eta.5-C13H8)MCl2 and [3,6-ditButC13H6-SiMe2- NtBu]MCl2 (M=Hf, Zr or Ti): mechanistic aspects of the catalytic formation of a isotactic-syndiotactic stereoblock-type polypropylene", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 621(1-2), 267-276 CODEN: JORCAI; ISSN: 0022-328X JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 621(1-2), 267-276 CODEN: JORCAI; ISSN: 0022-328X, (2001), XP004231263 [A] 1-14 * page 268; figure 2 * * page 271 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(00)00863-9 |