EP1526372 - Microfluidic system with adjustment for an optical detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falk-Jordan, Stefan Bienwaldstrasse 2 76187, Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Hans-Peter Pfinztalstrasse 64 76227, Karlsruhe / DE | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Hewlett-Packard-Strasse 8 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | Barth, Daniel, et al c/o Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH, Patentabteilung, Herrenbergerstrasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04105452.9 | 02.11.2004 | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1526372 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1526372 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03, B01L3/00, G01N27/447, // G02B27/62 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/44721 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
G01N21/05 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/04] |
Former [2005/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrofluidsystem mit Justierung für eine optische Detektion | [2005/17] | English: | Microfluidic system with adjustment for an optical detection | [2005/17] | French: | Système microfluidique avec un ajustement pour détection optique | [2005/17] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2013 | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/13] | 21.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 28.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5726751 (ALTENDORF ERIC H [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 12 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 18 * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]US6251615 (OBERHARDT BRUCE J [US]) [X] 1,7-11,13 * column 20, line 20 - line 26 * * column 27, line 37 - column 29, line 26 * * figures 8,13-16 *; | [X]EP1215479 (BAYER AG [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] * * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2002092973 (NAGLE ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 2,4 *; | [X]WO2004055509 (BIOCAL TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,13 * abstract * * page 8, line 18 - page 11, line 23 ** figures 1-8 * | Examination | US5381231 | US2002123073 |