EP1531368 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2012/23] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuzaki, Koichi@c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku 108-8551, Tokyo / JP | [2012/23] |
Former [2005/20] | 01 /
Matsuzaki, Koichi c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22 Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku 108-8551, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/13] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2005/20] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04105646.6 | 09.11.2004 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | JP20030380829 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003380829 | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1531368 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1531368 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
G03G15/0808 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0634 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/06] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildformungsapparat | [2005/20] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2005/20] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image | [2005/20] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5114823 (TOMURA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]US5862444 (MACHIDA JUNJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 25, line 60 - column 29, line 6 *; | [XY]US5978635 (AZUMA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 8 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 67 * [Y] 1-7; | [XA]US6049689 (ISHII HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8 * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 13; figure 1 * [A] 1-7; | [XY]US6178303 (ISHII HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8 * column 6, line 45 - line 65; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-7; | [A]US6198893 (ICHIKAWA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 53 - column 14, line 38 *; | [XA]US6345166 (SAKAIZAWA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 8 * column 4, line 47 - column 14, line 11; figures 1,2,4,5 * [A] 1-7 | by applicant | US5862444 | US5978635 | US6049689 | US6178303 | US6345166 |