EP1548215 - LEVER-OPERATED DEVICE FOR FASTENING THE DOOR OF THE BODY OF TRUCKS, TRAILERS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pastore & Lombardi S.r.l. Via Don Minzoni, 3 40057 Cadriano di Granarolo Emilia (Bologna) / IT | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILBE, Luca Via Collegio di Spagna, 7/2 40137, BOLOGNA / IT | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/26] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04105665.6 | 10.11.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00122U | 28.11.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030122 U | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548215 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548215 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548215 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/16 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
E05B83/10 (EP);
E05B13/002 (EP);
E05B39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Hebelartige Verschlussvorrichtung für Türe von Lastkraftwagen, Anhänger oder dergleichen | [2005/26] | English: | LEVER-OPERATED DEVICE FOR FASTENING THE DOOR OF THE BODY OF TRUCKS, TRAILERS AND THE LIKE | [2005/26] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage à levier pour une porte de camions, remorques ou similaires | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | IE | 10.11.2009 | LU | 10.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
IE | 10.11.2009 | ||
LU | 10.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 10.11.2009 | ||
LU | 10.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 10.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 08.04.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0893558 (PASTORE & LOMBARDI SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002056999 (EHRLICH RODNEY P [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [PX]EP1460210 (PASTORE & LOMBARDI SRL [IT]) [PX] 1 * column 3, lines 22-26 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1460210 |