EP1541765 - Coater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Méndez, Benjamin Griesäckerstr. 16 89551, Königsbronn / DE | 02 /
Ueberschär, Manfred Kiefernweg 3 89547, Gerstetten / DE | 03 /
Bohnenkamp, Bernd Lindenstr. 40 41470 Neuss / DE | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Méndez, Benjamin Griesäckerstr. 16 89551, Königsbronn / DE | ||
02 /
Ueberschär, Manfred Kiefernweg 3 89547, Gerstetten / DE | |||
03 /
Bohnenkamp, Bernd Apartment 2 1063 Stillmeadow Lane Menasha, WI Wisconsin 54952 / US | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04105788.6 | 16.11.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | DE2003158508 | 13.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10358508 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541765 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541765 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/48 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
D21H23/48 (EP);
B05C5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung | [2005/24] | English: | Coater | [2005/24] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/06] | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.08.2007 | CZ | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | EE | 08.08.2007 | GB | 08.08.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | PL | 08.08.2007 | RO | 08.08.2007 | SI | 08.08.2007 | SK | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | BG | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | LU | 16.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | IS | 08.12.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | HU | 09.02.2008 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
LU | 16.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 08.08.2007 | |
CZ | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SI | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
EE | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
RO | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 08.08.2007 | |
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
GB | 08.08.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SK | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
PL | 08.08.2007 | ||
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
BG | 08.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
IS | 08.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19903559 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19829449 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [AD]DE10012257 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure - * |