EP1533232 - Product packing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states G.D Societa' Per Azioni Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tacchi, Alver Via Vittoria, 2 40100 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Spatafora, Mario Via Silone, 14 40057 Granarolo / IT | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Jorio, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Studio Torta S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 04105880.1 | 18.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | IT2003BO00706 | 21.11.2003 Original published format: IT BO20030706 | [2005/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533232 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533232 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/22, B65B11/32, B65B41/16 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B65B41/18 (EP,US);
B65B19/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Verpackungsvorrichtung | [2005/21] | English: | Product packing unit | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif d'emballage | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2008 | BE | 13.02.2008 | CY | 13.02.2008 | CZ | 13.02.2008 | DK | 13.02.2008 | EE | 13.02.2008 | FI | 13.02.2008 | IT | 13.02.2008 | NL | 13.02.2008 | PL | 13.02.2008 | RO | 13.02.2008 | SI | 13.02.2008 | SK | 13.02.2008 | TR | 13.02.2008 | BG | 13.05.2008 | SE | 13.05.2008 | GR | 14.05.2008 | ES | 24.05.2008 | IS | 13.06.2008 | PT | 14.07.2008 | HU | 14.08.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
TR | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
HU | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
IT | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CY | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
BG | 13.05.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
EE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
NL | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
RO | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SK | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 14.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
DK | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
SE | 13.05.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
SI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
BE | 13.02.2008 | ||
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
PL | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 13.02.2008 | |
FI | 13.02.2008 | ||
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 13.02.2008 | |
ES | 24.05.2008 | ||
IS | 13.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2279843 (LOVELL SMITH ELMER, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 22-52 - column 3, lines 41-64; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-8; | [A]EP0574788 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0792805 (SASIB SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * column 8, lines 30-39; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0940339 (GD SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8* column 6, lines 13-43; figures 1,3 * |