EP1548619 - Method and device for automated layer generation for double-gate finFET designs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLER, Ingo Hegelstrasse 12 71093, Weil im Schönbuch / DE | 02 /
GERNHOEFER, Veit Nuertinger Str. 14 71032, Boeblingen / DE | 03 /
KEINERT, Joachim Hoelderlinstr. 27 71155, Altdorf / DE | 04 /
LUDWIG, Thomas Im Winkel 10 71063, Sindelfingen / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Teufel, Fritz IBM Deutschland GmbH Intellectual Property 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland GmbH, Intellectual Property, Pascalstrasse 100 70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04106287.8 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | EP20030104921 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03104921 | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/26] | EP31049216 | 22.12.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548619 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548619 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01L21/84 (EP);
G06F30/39 (EP);
H01L29/7851 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatisierten Erzeugung von Schichten von Doppel-Gate-FinFET-Entwürfen | [2005/26] | English: | Method and device for automated layer generation for double-gate finFET designs | [2005/26] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la génération automatique de couches pour des conceptions de FinFET à double grille | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9530198 (CADENCE DESIGN SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,11,15 * page 9, line 15 - page 13, line 3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2003145299 (FRIED DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] ** figure 1 * |