EP1555699 - Cover for actuator casing and method of manufacturing such cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states VDO Automotive AG Siemensstrasse 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive AG Siemensstrasse 12 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unruh, Marcus Kellerweg 11 93197 Zeitlarn / DE | 02 /
Plechner, Klaus Troppauer Strasse 15 a 93197 Zeitlarn / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 04106604.4 | 15.12.2004 | [2005/29] | Priority number, date | DE20041001677 | 12.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004001677 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1555699 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1555699 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1555699 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1555699 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/053 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
H10N30/875 (EP);
H10N30/88 (EP);
H10N30/886 (EP);
H10N30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/08] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abdeckung für ein Aktorgehäuse und Herstellungsverfahren für eine solche Abdeckung | [2005/29] | English: | Cover for actuator casing and method of manufacturing such cover | [2005/29] | French: | Couvercle pour boîtier d'actionneur et procédé de fabrication d'un tel couvercle | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, IT | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.01.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5113108 (YAMASHITA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,5-7,19,22,23 * column 3, lines 25-53; figures 3-6 *; | [A]US5243492 (MARQUIT ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 4,21* column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 13 *; | [X]US5477102 (MIYOSHI TAKAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,15,18-21 * column 3, lines 32-67; figures 2,4 *; | [XY]DE19818068 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,15-17 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 48 * [Y] 5,6,8,22-24; | [XY]DE19844743 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,15-19 * figure 1 * [Y] 5,6,8,22-24; | [DX]DE19940346 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,5,6,15-19,22,23 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]WO03069152 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,15-18 * page 2, line 35 - page 6, line 18; figures 2,3 * [Y] 2,5-8,19,22-24 |