EP1548588 - Method of translating computer program code, communications system and network management entity therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitchell, Kevin Agilent Technologies UK Limited Scotstoun Avenue EH30 9TG, South Queensferry / GB | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies Sàrl 29, rue de la Gare 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies International Sàrl 29, rue de la Gare 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2005/26] | Coker, David Graeme, et al Agilent Technologies UK Ltd Legal Department Eskdale Road Winnersh Triangle Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 5DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04106653.1 | 16.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | GB20030029246 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: GB 0329246 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548588 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548588 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/45 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G06F9/4488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methode zum Umwandeln von Rechnerprogrammkode, Kommunikationssystem und Netzwerkverwaltungsentität dafür | [2005/26] | English: | Method of translating computer program code, communications system and network management entity therefor | [2005/26] | French: | Procédé pour transformer code programme d'ordinateur, système de communication et système pour la gestion de réseau | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5978586 (BAISLEY DONALD EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 19 - column 3, line 56 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 38 * * column 9, line 17 - column 12, line 28 * * figures 1-4b; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US6199068 (CARPENTER RICHARD CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-6,8,11 * abstract * * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 40 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 32 * * column 13, line 32 - column 16, line 31 * * column 26, line 51 - column 31, line 33 * * column 31, line 44 - line 54 * * column 40, line 43 - column 44, line 48 ** figures 1-34d; claims 1-27 *; | [X]WO0146837 (DATAPOWER TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8,11 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 11 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 20 * * page 14, line 6 - page 17, line 21 * * page 18, line 16 - page 22, line 28 * * page 23, line 4 - page 24, line 15 * * figures 1-10; claims 1-15 *; | [X]US2002091702 (MULLINS WARD [US]) [X] 1-6,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0174] * * paragraph [0176] - paragraph [0181] * * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0207] - paragraph [0216] * * paragraph [0252] - paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0269] - paragraph [0280] * * paragraph [0304] - paragraph [0306] * * figures 1-7; claims 1-15 * |