EP1445737 - Franking apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE SA 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | [2005/41] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbert, Raymond John 34 Stirling Avenue Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 3PP / GB | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2004/33] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250547.9 | 02.02.2004 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | GB20030002277 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0302277 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445737 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445737 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00379 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00427 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00604 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/20] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine und Frankiermethode | [2004/33] | English: | Franking apparatus and method | [2004/33] | French: | Appareil et Méthode d'affranchissement | [2004/33] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 16.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/02] | 19.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4900904 (WRIGHT CHRISTOPHER B [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * column 12, line 30 - column 13, line 53; figures 6a,6b * * column 9, line 6 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0543395 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * column 6, line 31 - column 8, line 1 ** claim 1 *; | [X]US6175825 (FRUECHTEL INGRID [DE]) [X] 1-34 * column 6, line 1 - line 63; figure 1 * * column 10, line 21 - column 11, line 8 * * column 11, line 56 - line 64; figure 7 *; | [X]US6321214 (THIEL WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1-34 * column 15, line 4 - line 20 * * column 16, line 43 - column 17, line 14 * * column 17, line 60 - column 18, line 49 * * column 19, line 41 * * column 20, line 9 - line 17 * * column 25, line 33 - line 39 * * column 26, line 5 - line 12 * * column 26, line 49 - line 59 * * column 40, line 36 - column 42, line 40 * * column 35, line 3 - line 21 * |