EP1462070 - Friction reducing agent for loading a self-expanding stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Cordis Corporation 14201 N.W. 60th Avenue Miami Lakes Florida 33014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Karen Paulette 2250 NW 139 Street Opa-locka, FL 33054 / US | 02 /
Widenhouse, William 610 SW 164th Avenue Pembroke Pines, FL 33027 / US | 03 /
Parker, Jonathan George 122 SW 164th Terrace Pembroke Pines, FL 33027 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250848.1 | 18.02.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | US20030370667 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 370667 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462070 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462070 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462070 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/9522 (EP,US);
A61F2/9526 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49885 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Reibungsverminderendes Mittel zum laden eines selbstexpandierender Stents | [2004/40] | English: | Friction reducing agent for loading a self-expanding stent | [2004/40] | French: | Agent de réduction de friction pour chargement d'un stent autodéployable | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0826346 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO0134219 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 16 *; | [L]EP1459706 (CORDIS CORP [US]) [L] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US4580568 | US4665771 | US4665905 | US4732152 | US4733665 | US4925445 | WO9833443 | EP1025813 |